OK HCR1013 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 42-13)
Status: Passed on April 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Route 66; requesting that the Congress of the United States either extend the Route 66 Corridor Preservation Program or designate Route 66 as a National Historic Trail; distribution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Route 66; requesting that the Congress of the United States either extend the Route 66 Corridor Preservation Program or designate Route 66 as a National Historic Trail; distribution.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-19HouseFiled with Secretary of State
2018-04-19SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2018-04-19HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2018-04-18HouseReferred for enrollment
2018-04-18SenateAdopted, returned to House
2018-04-18SenateCoauthored by all other Senators
2018-04-18SenateDirect to Calendar
2018-03-29Senatecoauthored by Sears
2018-03-29SenateFirst Reading
2018-03-29HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2018-03-28HouseAdopted, referred for engrossment
2018-03-28HouseAuthored by Senator Sparks (principal Senate author)
2018-03-28HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Perryman, Condit, Blancett, Wright
2018-03-28HouseConsidered
2018-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Hoskin
2018-02-06HouseIntroduced

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback