OK HCR1009 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HCR1009

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 62-25)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Coauthored by Senator Dossett
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Oklahoma Health Care Authority; directing the Authority to refrain from awarding certain contract; distribution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oklahoma Health Care Authority; directing the Authority to refrain from awarding certain contract; distribution.

Sponsors

Rep. Scott Martin [R]Sen. Ervin Yen [R]Rep. Ed Cannaday [D]Rep. John Enns [R]
Rep. Scott Inman [D]Rep. Todd Thomsen [R]Rep. George Faught [R]Rep. Eric Proctor [D]
Rep. Earl Sears [R]Rep. Cory Williams [D]Rep. Pat Ownbey [R]Rep. Tommy Hardin [R]
Rep. Emily Virgin [D]Rep. Dennis Casey [R]Rep. Josh Cockroft [R]Rep. Donnie Condit [D]
Rep. Mike Sanders [R]Rep. Harold Wright [R]Rep. Leslie Osborn [R]Rep. Weldon Watson [R]
Rep. Kevin Wallace [R]Rep. John Pfeiffer [R]Rep. Ben Loring [D]Rep. Mark Lepak [R]
Rep. John Jordan [R]Rep. Claudia Griffith [D]Rep. Jason Dunnington [D]Rep. Chad Caldwell [R]
Rep. Jon Echols [R]Rep. Scott McEachin [R]Rep. Ryan Martinez [R]Rep. Mark Lawson [R]
Rep. Justin Humphrey [R]Rep. Kyle Hilbert [R]Rep. Avery Frix [R]Rep. Roger Ford [R]
Rep. Scott Fetgatter [R]Rep. Tim Downing [R]Rep. Rande Worthen [R]Rep. Tammy West [R]
Rep. Kevin West [R]Rep. Josh West [R]Rep. Collin Walke [D]Rep. Mike Osburn [R]
Rep. Monroe Nichols [D]Rep. Matt Meredith [D]Rep. Marcus McEntire [R]Rep. Dale Derby [R]
Rep. Carol Bush [R]Rep. Forrest Bennett [D]Rep. Rhonda Baker [R]Rep. Greg Babinec [R]
Rep. Cyndi Munson [D]Rep. Regina Goodwin [D]Rep. George Young [D]Rep. David Perryman [D]
Rep. Mark McBride [R]Rep. Charles McCall [R]Rep. Bobby Cleveland [R]Rep. Brian Renegar [D]
Sen. Randy Bass [D]Rep. Mike Brown [D]Sen. John Sparks [D]Sen. Paul Scott [R]
Sen. Dave Rader [R]Sen. Dewayne Pemberton [R]Sen. Roland Pederson [R]Sen. Lonnie Paxton [R]
Sen. Chris Kidd [R]Sen. Tom Dugger [R]Sen. Julie Daniels [R]Sen. Micheal Bergstrom [R]
Sen. J.J. Dossett [D]Sen. Kevin Matthews [D]Sen. Joseph Silk [R]Sen. Marty Quinn [R]
Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D]Sen. Darcy Jech [R]Sen. Kay Floyd [D]Sen. Jack Fry [R]
Sen. Wayne Shaw [R]Sen. Rob Standridge [R]Sen. Larry Boggs [R]Sen. Ron Sharp [R]
Sen. Frank Simpson [R]Sen. Josh Brecheen [R]Sen. Anthony Sykes [R]

Roll Calls

2017-05-16 - House - House: ADOPT RESOLUTION (Y: 83 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18SenateCoauthored by Senator Dossett
2017-05-18SenateCoauthored by Senator Bass
2017-05-18SenateCoauthored by Senator Matthews
2017-05-18SenateCoauthored by Senator Floyd
2017-05-18SenateCoauthored by Senator Sparks
2017-05-18SenateCoauthored by Senator Brown
2017-05-18SenateCoauthored by Senator Bergstrom
2017-05-18SenateCoauthored by Senator Shaw
2017-05-18SenateCoauthored by Senator Silk
2017-05-18SenateCoauthored by Senator Boggs
2017-05-18SenateCoauthored by Senator Brecheen
2017-05-18SenateCoauthored by Senator Quinn
2017-05-18SenateCoauthored by Senator Dugger
2017-05-18SenateCoauthored by Senator Kidd
2017-05-18SenateCoauthored by Senator Jech
2017-05-18SenateCoauthored by Senator Pederson
2017-05-18SenateCoauthored by Senator Pemberton
2017-05-18SenateCoauthored by Senator Fry
2017-05-18SenateCoauthored by Senator Daniels
2017-05-18SenateCoauthored by Senator Scott
2017-05-18SenateCoauthored by Senator Rader
2017-05-18SenateCoauthored by Senator Simpson
2017-05-18SenateCoauthored by Senator Standridge
2017-05-18SenateCoauthored by Senator Sharp
2017-05-17SenateCoauthored by Senator Pittman
2017-05-17SenateCoauthored by Senator Paxton
2017-05-17SenateCoauthored by Senator Sykes
2017-05-17SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-17HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-05-16HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-05-16HouseAyes: 83 Nays: 4
2017-05-16HouseAdopted
2017-05-16HouseAmended
2017-05-16HouseAuthored by Senator Yen (principal Senate author)
2017-05-16HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Lawson, Osborn (Leslie), Thomsen, Cleveland, Faught, Wallace, Derby, McEntire, McCall, Humphrey, Frix, Hardin, Inman, Downing, Ownbey, Bush, West (Josh), Casey, Worthen, Loring, Virgin, Williams, Nichols, McBride, Sanders, McEachin, Wright, Baker, West (Tammy), Martinez, Munson, Cockroft, Condit, Babinec, Enns, West (Kevin), Perryman, Caldwell, Renegar, Hilbert, Cannaday, Bennett (Forrest), Meredith, Dunnington, Lepak, Griffith, Pfeiffer, Walke, Ford, Young, Osburn (Mike), Proctor, Sears, Jordan, Watson, Fetgatter, Echols, Goodwin
2017-05-16HouseConsidered
2017-05-10HouseAuthored by Representative Martin
2017-05-10HouseIntroduced

Same As/Similar To

HCR1009 (Carry Over) 2017-05-18 - Coauthored by Senator Dossett

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback