OK HCR1007 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HCR1007

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Article V Convention; authorizing delegation for preconvention gathering and for Article V Convention; filing and distribution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Article V Convention; authorizing delegation for preconvention gathering and for Article V Convention; filing and distribution.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-03 - House - House: V TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 52 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26HouseFiled with Secretary of State
2017-05-26SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2017-05-26HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2017-05-25HouseReferred for enrollment
2017-05-25SenateAdopted, returned to House Ayes: 33 Nays: 8
2017-05-25SenateDirect to Calendar
2017-05-04SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-04HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-05-03HouseAdopted, referred for engrossment
2017-05-03HouseAmended
2017-05-03HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Standridge, Yen
2017-05-03HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Lawson
2017-05-03HouseConsidered
2017-04-24HouseAuthored by Senator Brecheen (principal Senate author)
2017-04-24HouseAuthored by Representative Lepak
2017-04-24HouseIntroduced

Same As/Similar To

HCR1007 (Carry Over) 2017-05-26 - Filed with Secretary of State

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback