OK HB2649 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2649
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Community sentencing; expanding purpose of the Oklahoma Community Sentencing Act; effective date.
Title
Community sentencing; expanding purpose of the Oklahoma Community Sentencing Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-26 | House | Approved by Governor 04/26/2023 |
2023-04-20 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2023-04-20 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2023-04-19 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2023-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2023-03-08 | House | General Order |
2023-02-22 | House | Authored by Senator Gollihare (principal Senate author) |
2023-02-22 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Steagall |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2649 (Carry Over) 2023-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2023