OK HB1886 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1886
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-02 - Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-02 - Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Teacher certification; establishing the Data Governance Council; effective date.
Title
Teacher certification; establishing the Data Governance Council; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Education: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2024-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 6 |
2024-03-12 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ranson |
2024-03-12 | House | General Order |
2024-02-29 | House | Authored by Senator Pemberton (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-29 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2023-02-20 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Waldron |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1886 (Carry Over) 2023-02-20 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee