OK HB1194 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1194
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-16 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-16 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; school and church buses; white strobe lamps; effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; school and church buses; white strobe lamps; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick West [R] | Sen. Mark Allen [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative West (Rick) |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1194 (Carry Over) 2017-02-16 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee