OK HB1029 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1029
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Approved by Governor 04/19/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Approved by Governor 04/19/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Professions and occupations; Oklahoma Security Guard and Private Investigator Act; modifying certain definition to include active reserve certified peace officers; effective date.
Title
Professions and occupations; Oklahoma Security Guard and Private Investigator Act; modifying certain definition to include active reserve certified peace officers; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | House | Approved by Governor 04/19/2021 |
2021-04-13 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-13 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-12 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2021-03-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-02 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-01 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-01 | House | Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-01 | House | General Order |
2021-02-09 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Kerbs |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1029 (Carry Over) 2021-04-19 - Approved by Governor 04/19/2021