OK HB1001 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1001
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-01 - CR; Do Pass State Powers Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-01 - CR; Do Pass State Powers Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Firearms; modifying certain age requirement; emergency.
Title
Firearms; modifying certain age requirement; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Olsen [R] | Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-01 - House - House: State Powers Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass State Powers Committee |
2023-02-27 | House | Referred to State Powers |
2023-02-27 | House | Withdrawn from Public Safety Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Olsen |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1001 (Carry Over) 2023-03-01 - CR; Do Pass State Powers Committee