OH SR175 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-20 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To express support for the Hyperloop Transportation Initiative.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To express support for the Hyperloop Transportation Initiative.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-20 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-07 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-20SenateAdopted
2017-09-07SenateReported - Amended: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
2017-06-15SenateRefer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
2017-06-08SenateOffered

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback