OH SCR9 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Reported: Armed Services, Veterans Affairs, and Public Safety
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Reported: Armed Services, Veterans Affairs, and Public Safety
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To urge the Congress of the United States to disapprove the Iranian nuclear agreement known as the Joint Comprehensive Plan of Action.
Title
Urge disapproval of Iranian nuclear agreement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-13 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-23 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-23 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-23 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-23 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Reported: Armed Services, Veterans Affairs, and Public Safety |
2015-10-01 | House | Introduced and Referred to Committee: Armed Services, Veterans Affairs, and Public Safety |
2015-09-28 | House | Offered |
2015-09-23 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-09-23 | Senate | Reported: Rules and Reference |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Rules and Reference |
2015-09-14 | Senate | Offered |