OH SCR21 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 33-8)
Status: Passed on December 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-13 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 33-8)
Status: Passed on December 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-13 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To urge the Congress of the United States to enact various bills advancing the development of an Appalachian storage hub.
Title
Advance development of Appalachian storage hub
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-13 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-13 - House - House Adopted (Y: 84 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-13 - House - House Adopted (Y: 84 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-13 | House | Adopted |
2018-12-13 | House | Manually Generate Message Element |
2018-12-13 | House | Reported: Energy and Natural Resources |
2018-11-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to Committee: Energy and Natural Resources |
2018-07-02 | House | Offered |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Reported: Public Utilities |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Public Utilities |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Offered |