OH SCR21 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-24 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-24 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To urge the United States Department of Transportation (USDOT) to select the City of Columbus as the award winner for the USDOT Smart City Challenge.
Title
Urge selecting Columbus winner in Smart City Challenge
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-24 - House - House Adopted (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-24 | House | Adopted |
2016-05-18 | House | Reported: Government Accountability and Oversight |
2016-05-17 | House | Introduced and Referred to Committee: Government Accountability and Oversight |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Adopted |