OH SCR15 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 39-24)
Status: Passed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 39-24)
Status: Passed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To designate 2018 as "Ohio's Year of the Trails."
Title
Designate 2018 as Ohio's Year of the Trails
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-07 - House - House Adopted (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-29 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-16 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-29 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-16 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | House | Adopted |
2018-02-21 | House | Reported: State and Local Government |
2017-12-04 | House | Introduced and Referred to Committee: State and Local Government |
2017-11-30 | House | Offered |
2017-11-29 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-11-16 | Senate | Reported: Energy and Natural Resources |
2017-09-20 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Energy and Natural Resources |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Offered |