OH SCR1 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 47-28)
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To urge the Congress of the United States to enact the Mark Takai Atomic Veterans Healthcare Parity Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urge Congress enact Mark Takai Atomic Veterans Healthcare Act

Sponsors

Sen. Timothy Schaffer [R]Rep. Jamie Callender [R]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Erica Crawley [D]
Rep. Jon Cross [R]Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]Rep. Alessandro Cutrona [R]Rep. Sedrick Denson [D]
Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Diane Grendell [R]
Rep. Jennifer Gross [R]Rep. James Hoops [R]Rep. Larry Householder [R]Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]
Rep. Dontavius Jarrells [D]Rep. Don Jones [R]Rep. Darrell Kick [R]Rep. Brian Lampton [R]
Rep. Michele Lepore-Hagan [D]Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]Rep. Riordan McClain [R]Rep. Adam Miller [D]
Rep. Jessica Miranda [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Rep. Scott Oelslager [R]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]
Rep. Gail Pavliga [R]Rep. Phil Plummer [R]Rep. Sharon Ray [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]
Rep. Phillip Robinson [D]Rep. Bill Roemer [R]Rep. Allison Russo [D]Rep. Jean Schmidt [R]
Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Michael Skindell [D]Rep. Kent Smith [D]Rep. Monique Smith [D]
Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. D. J. Swearingen [R]Rep. Bride Sweeney [D]
Rep. Daniel Troy [D]Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]Rep. Andrea White [R]Rep. Shane Wilkin [R]
Rep. Tom Young [R]Sen. Louis Blessing [R]Sen. Andrew Brenner [R]Sen. Jerry Cirino [R]
Sen. Hearcel Craig [D]Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]Sen. Teresa Fedor [D]Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R]
Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]Sen. Terry Johnson [R]
Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]Sen. Tina Maharath [D]Sen. Robert McColley [R]Sen. Sandra O'Brien [R]
Sen. Bob Peterson [R]Sen. Bill Reineke [R]Sen. Kristina Roegner [R]Sen. Mark Romanchuk [R]
Sen. Michael Rulli [R]Sen. Kirk Schuring [R]Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]
Sen. Sandra Williams [D]Sen. Steve Wilson [R]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2021-06-10 - House - House Adopted (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-10HouseAdopted
2021-05-25HouseReported: Armed Services and Veterans Affairs
2021-03-24HouseIntroduced and Referred to Committee: Armed Services and Veterans Affairs
2021-03-23HouseOffered
2021-03-17SenateAdopted
2021-03-03SenateReported: Veterans and Public Safety
2021-02-03SenateRefer to Committee: Veterans and Public Safety
2021-02-02SenateOffered

Subjects


Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-SCR-1
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/resolutions/scr1/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/resolutions/scr1/RS/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/resolutions/scr1/AS/02?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/resolutions/scr1/RH/03/scr1_03_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/resolutions/scr1/AH/04/scr1_04_AH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/resolutions/scr1/EN/05/scr1_05_EN?format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-SCR-1

Bill Comments 750

feedback