OH SB81 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 57-13)
Status: Passed on November 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-05 - Effective 11/5/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend section 2923.125 of the Revised Code to waive the concealed carry license fee for active members of the armed forces and retired and honorably discharged veterans, to accept military experience with firearms as proof of competency with firearms regardless of when the applicant for a license acquired the experience, to permit a licensee to renew a concealed handgun license at any time before the expiration of the license, and to require the Attorney General to monitor the number of license fees waived and cap the total amount allowed to be waived at $1.5 million.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise licensing rules for military personnel concealed carry

Sponsors

Sen. Louis Terhar [R]Sen. William Coley [R]Sen. Kevin Bacon [R]Sen. Bill Beagle [R]
Sen. Edna Brown [D]Sen. Dave Burke [R]Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]Sen. John Eklund [R]
Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]Sen. Matt Huffman [R]
Sen. Kris Jordan [R]Sen. Frank LaRose [R]Sen. Peggy Lehner [R]Sen. Gayle Manning [R]
Sen. Robert McColley [R]Sen. Larry Obhof [R]Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]
Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]Sen. Joseph Uecker [R]Sen. Sandra Williams [D]
Sen. Jason Wilson [D]Rep. Al Landis [R]Rep. Rick Perales [R]Rep. Marlene Anielski [R]
Rep. John Becker [R]Rep. Louis Blessing [R]Rep. Andrew Brenner [R]Rep. James Butler [R]
Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Nicholas Celebrezze [D]Rep. Hearcel Craig [D]Rep. Bill Dean [R]
Rep. Jonathan Dever [R]Rep. Keith Faber [R]Rep. Theresa Gavarone [R]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]
Rep. Doug Green [R]Rep. Christina Hagan [R]Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]Rep. Michael Henne [R]
Rep. Glenn Holmes [D]Rep. James Hoops [R]Sen. Jim Hughes [R]Rep. Terry Johnson [R]
Rep. Candice Keller [R]Rep. Bernadine Kent [D]Rep. Darrell Kick [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]
Rep. George Lang [R]Rep. Riordan McClain [R]Rep. Derek Merrin [R]Rep. Eugene Miller [D]
Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Rep. Wes Retherford [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Kristina Roegner [R]
Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Mark Romanchuk [R]Rep. Scott Ryan [R]Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]
Rep. Gary Scherer [R]Rep. William Seitz [R]Rep. Robert Sprague [R]Rep. Scott Wiggam [R]
Rep. Shane Wilkin [R]Rep. Ron Young [R]

Roll Calls

2018-06-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 84 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-05 Effective 11/5/18
2018-06-27HousePassed
2018-03-22HouseReported: Armed Services, Veterans Affairs, and Homeland Security
2018-01-24HouseRefer to Committee: Armed Services, Veterans Affairs, and Homeland Security
2018-01-18HouseIntroduced
2018-01-17SenatePassed
2017-12-06SenateReported: Judiciary
2017-03-07SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2017-03-02SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2923Amended CodeCitation Text
2923125Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback