OH SB78 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-8)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-12 - Refer to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety
Pending: House Transportation and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-12 - Refer to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety
Pending: House Transportation and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 5534.45 of the Revised Code to designate a portion of State Route 7 in Jefferson County as the "U.S. Air Force Staff Sergeant Yvonne Marie Fair Memorial Highway."
Title
USAF Staff Sgt Yvonne Marie Fair Memorial Highway
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-12 | House | Refer to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety |
2017-06-22 | House | Introduced |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Reported: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
55 | 34 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
55 | 34 | 45 | New Code | See Bill Text |