OH SB73 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Refer to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety
Pending: House Transportation and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Refer to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety
Pending: House Transportation and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 4511.46 of the Revised Code to alter the law governing yielding to pedestrians in crosswalks.
Title
Alter law governing yielding to pedestrians in crosswalks
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | House | Refer to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety |
2020-05-05 | House | Introduced |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Reported: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Public Safety
Transportation
Transportation : Highways, Roads, and Bridges
Transportation : Motor Vehicles
Transportation
Transportation : Highways, Roads, and Bridges
Transportation : Motor Vehicles
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
45 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 11 | 46 | Amended Code | Citation Text |