OH SB7 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-24 - Effective 9/24/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-24 - Effective 9/24/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To enact sections 2925.34 and 4301.71 of the Revised Code to prohibit the sale of pure caffeine products and to prohibit the sale of powdered or crystalline alcohol for human consumption.
Title
Prohibits sale of pure caffeine products
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-24 | Effective 9/24/15 | |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Concurred in House amendments |
2015-05-27 | House | Passed |
2015-05-27 | House | Reported - Substitute: Government Accountability and Oversight |
2015-05-12 | House | Refer to Committee: Government Accountability and Oversight |
2015-04-30 | House | Introduced |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Passed |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Criminal Justice |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Health and Human Services : Health Care
Health and Human Services : Public Health
Health and Human Services : Health Care
Health and Human Services : Public Health
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
29 | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
29 | 25 | 34 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
43 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 01 | 71 | New Code | See Bill Text |