OH SB66 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice
Pending: House Criminal Justice Committee
Hearing: May 22 @ 1:00 pm in Room 114
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 2929.11, 2929.13, 2929.15, 2929.16, 2929.19, 2951.041, 2953.31, 2967.16, 2967.28, 5503.02, and 5747.99 of the Revised Code to modify criminal sentencing and corrections law by including the promotion of effective rehabilitation as a purpose of felony sentencing, removing the one-year minimum for presumptive fourth or fifth degree felony community control sanctions, modifying sanctions for a violation of a community control condition, modifying the manner of calculating confinement credits, modifying eligibility criteria and procedures for granting intervention in lieu of conviction, making offenders convicted of certain multiple fourth or fifth degree felonies eligible for conviction record sealing, revising procedures for the Adult Parole Authority to grant a final release or terminate post-release control, and modifying the criteria for considering a prison term sanction for a post-release control violation; to extend the State Highway Patrol's authority to enforce criminal laws to also apply to the Northeast Ohio Correctional Center; and to modify the penalty for an employer's failure to remit state income taxes withheld from an employee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modify criminal sentencing and corrections law

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-06HouseRefer to Committee: Criminal Justice
2018-03-01HouseIntroduced
2018-02-28SenatePassed
2018-02-28SenateReported - Substitute: Judiciary
2017-02-22SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2017-02-21SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2929Amended CodeCitation Text
292911Amended CodeCitation Text
292913Amended CodeCitation Text
292915Amended CodeCitation Text
292916Amended CodeCitation Text
292919Amended CodeCitation Text
2951Amended CodeCitation Text
2951041Amended CodeCitation Text
2953Amended CodeCitation Text
295331Amended CodeCitation Text
2967Amended CodeCitation Text
296716Amended CodeCitation Text
296728Amended CodeCitation Text
55Amended CodeCitation Text
5503Amended CodeCitation Text
550302Amended CodeCitation Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5747Amended CodeCitation Text
574799Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback