OH SB53 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - Refer to Committee: Government Oversight
Pending: House Government Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - Refer to Committee: Government Oversight
Pending: House Government Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 3513.04 of the Revised Code to allow a primary candidate to become a candidate at the general election by being appointed to fill a ballot vacancy under certain circumstances.
Title
Allow primary election candidate fill ballot vacancy
Sponsors
Sen. Nathan Manning [R] | Sen. Jerry Cirino [R] | Sen. Bill Reineke [R] | Rep. Cecil Thomas [D] |
Sen. Kenny Yuko [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | House | Refer to Committee: Government Oversight |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Passed |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Local Government and Elections |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Local Government and Elections |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 13 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |