OH SB5 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-09-12 - Refer to Committee: Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend section 5747.70 of the Revised Code to increase the maximum income tax deduction for contributions to college savings accounts and disability expense savings accounts to $4,000 annually for each beneficiary, to create the Joint Committee on Ohio College Affordability, and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Address college affordability

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-12HouseRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2017-06-20HouseIntroduced
2017-06-15SenatePassed
2017-06-15SenateReported - Amended: Finance
2017-02-01SenateRefer to Committee: Finance
2017-01-31SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5747Amended CodeCitation Text
574770Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback