OH SB44 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-6)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Refer to Committee: Public Utilities
Pending: House Public Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 3706.40, 3706.41, 3706.43, 3706.45, 3706.46, 3706.49, 3706.55, and 3706.59; to enact section 3706.551; and to repeal sections 3706.53, 3706.61, and 5727.231 of the Revised Code to repeal the nuclear resource credit payment provisions, and amend, and rename as solar resource, the renewable resource credit payment provisions of H.B. 6 of the 133rd General Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions of HB6 of the 133rd GA

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-09HouseRefer to Committee: Public Utilities
2021-03-04HouseIntroduced
2021-03-03SenatePassed
2021-02-23SenateReported: Energy and Public Utilities
2021-02-03SenateRefer to Committee: Energy and Public Utilities
2021-02-02SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
370640Amended CodeCitation Text
370641Amended CodeCitation Text
370643Amended CodeCitation Text
370645Amended CodeCitation Text
370646Amended CodeCitation Text
370649Amended CodeCitation Text
370653Repealed CodeCitation Text
370655Amended CodeCitation Text
3706551New CodeSee Bill Text
370659Amended CodeCitation Text
370661Repealed CodeCitation Text
5727231Repealed CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-SB-44
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb44/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb44/RS/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb44/PS/02?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15581&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15641&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15741&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15752&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15892&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16082&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-SB-44

Bill Comments

feedback