OH SB43 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-10)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-11-23 - Informally passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To enact section 5.271 of the Revised Code to designate July as "Sarcoma Awareness Month" and to name the act Hank's Law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enact Hank's Law to designate Sarcoma Awareness Month

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-15 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-23HouseInformally passed
2021-11-16HouseInformally passed
2021-11-08HouseInformally passed
2021-10-26HouseInformally passed
2021-10-12HouseInformally passed
2021-09-29HouseInformally passed
2021-09-22HouseInformally passed
2021-06-28HouseInformally passed
2021-06-25HouseInformally passed
2021-06-15HouseReported: Health
2021-05-04HouseRefer to Committee: Health
2021-04-21SenatePassed
2021-03-03SenateReported: Health
2021-02-03SenateRefer to Committee: Health
2021-02-02SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-SB-43
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb43/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb43/RS/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb43/PS/02?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb43/RH/03/sb43_03_RH?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15692&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15799&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15853&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15880&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16386&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16428&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17049&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17041&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17042&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-SB-43

Bill Comments

feedback