OH SB42 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-05 - Reported - Re-referred to Finance: Rules and Reference
Pending: House Rules and Reference Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-05 - Reported - Re-referred to Finance: Rules and Reference
Pending: House Rules and Reference Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 5.022 of the Revised Code to adopt the 1905 Wright Flyer III as the state airplane.
Title
Adopt the 1905 Wright Flyer III as the state airplane
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-12-05 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-05 | House | Reported - Re-referred to Finance: Rules and Reference |
2023-11-30 | House | Re-referred: Rules and Reference |
2023-06-27 | House | Reported: State and Local Government |
2023-04-18 | House | Referred to committee: State and Local Government |
2023-04-04 | House | Introduced |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Passed |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Reported: Government Oversight |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to committee: Government Oversight |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
House Finance Committee
House Rules and Reference Committee
House State and Local Government Committee
Senate Government Oversight Committee
Special Designations : State Symbols
House Rules and Reference Committee
House State and Local Government Committee
Senate Government Oversight Committee
Special Designations : State Symbols