OH SB40 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To enact sections 5.2271 and 3701.137 of the Revised Code to designate November as "Complex Regional Pain Syndrome Awareness Month" and to require the Department of Health to include on its web site information regarding the syndrome.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To designate November as "Complex Regional Pain Syndrome Awareness Month" and to require the Department of Health to include on its web site information regarding the syndrome.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-11-27 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-13 Effective Date
2012-12-11 Governor' Action
2012-12-15 End of 10-day period
2012-12-04 Sent to Governor
2012-11-27 Concurrence
2011-11-30 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2011-11-21 Committee Report
2011-02-01 To Health, Human Services, & Aging
2011-02-01 Introduced to House
2012-11-27 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2012-01-25 Committee Report
2011-12-01 To Health & Aging
2011-12-01 Introduced to Senate

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
37New CodeSee Bill Text
3701New CodeSee Bill Text
3701137New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback