OH SB342 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-7)
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-7)
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 1901.20, 1907.02, 4511.094, and 4511.204; to amend, for the purpose of adopting a new section number as indicated in parentheses, section 4511.093 (4511.043); to enact sections 3937.411, 4511.095, 4511.096, 4511.097, 4511.098, 4511.099, 4511.0910, 4511.0911, 4511.0912, 4511.0913, and 4511.0914; to enact new sections 4511.092 and 4511.093; and to repeal section 4511.092 of the Revised Code to establish conditions for the use by local authorities of traffic law photo-monitoring devices to detect certain traffic law violations and to require the Department of Public Safety to issue a report on texting while driving citations.
Title
To establish conditions for the use by local authorities of traffic law photo-monitoring devices to detect certain traffic law violations and to require the Department of Public Safety to issue a report on texting while driving citations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-11 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Vote) (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-10 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 58 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-10 - House - House - Motion agreed to and so amended (Vote) (Y: 79 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-10 - House - House - Motion agreed to and so amended (Vote) (Y: 55 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-10 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 58 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-10 - House - House - Motion agreed to and so amended (Vote) (Y: 79 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-10 - House - House - Motion agreed to and so amended (Vote) (Y: 55 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-19 | Governor' Action | |
2014-12-30 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-12-18 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-12-11 | Concurrence | |
2014-11-19 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-11-19 | Committee Report - S | |
2014-05-20 | To State Government Oversight & Reform | |
2014-05-20 | Introduced to House | |
2014-12-10 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-12-10 | Committee Report | |
2014-11-20 | To Policy and Legislative Oversight | |
2014-11-20 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
19 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
19 | 01 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
19 | 07 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
39 | 37 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 37 | 411 | New Code | See Bill Text |
45 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
45 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 11 | 0910 | New Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 11 | 0911 | New Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 11 | 0912 | New Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 11 | 0913 | New Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 11 | 0914 | New Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 11 | 092 | New Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 11 | 093 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 11 | 094 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 11 | 095 | New Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 11 | 096 | New Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 11 | 097 | New Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 11 | 098 | New Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 11 | 099 | New Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 11 | 204 | Amended Code | Citation Text |