OH SB340 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 34-21)
Status: Passed on December 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-26 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 34-21)
Status: Passed on December 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-26 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 171.04, 742.01, 742.04, 742.10, 742.14, 742.16, 742.30, 742.301, 742.31, 742.32, 742.33, 742.34, 742.35, 742.37, 742.3711, 742.3716, 742.38, 742.39, 742.44, 742.442, 742.443, 742.444, 742.45, 742.63, and 742.64; to enact sections 742.012, 742.013, and 742.161; and to repeal section 742.011 of the Revised Code to revise the law governing the Ohio Police and Fire Pension Fund.
Title
To revise the law governing the Ohio Police and Fire Pension Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-09-12 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-12 - Senate - Senate - House Amendments (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-12 - Senate - Senate - House Amendments (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-26 | Effective Date | |
2012-09-26 | Governor' Action | |
2012-09-26 | End of 10-day period | |
2012-09-14 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-09-12 | Concurrence | |
2012-05-16 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2012-05-16 | Committee Report - S | |
2012-05-08 | To Insurance, Commerce, & Labor | |
2012-05-08 | Introduced to House | |
2012-09-12 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2012-09-10 | Committee Report - S | |
2012-05-17 | To Health & Aging | |
2012-05-17 | Introduced to Senate |