OH SB333 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 1109.22, 1304.55, 1321.52, and 1322.02 and to enact sections 1321.537, 1321.538, 1322.042, and 1322.043 of the Revised Code to authorize the Superintendent of Financial Institutions to issue a temporary mortgage loan originator license or temporary loan originator license to an out-of-state applicant who meets certain criteria, to make changes regarding derivative transactions by banks, and to make changes to the Uniform Commercial Funds Transfers law regarding remittance transfers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To authorize the Superintendent of Financial Institutions to issue a temporary mortgage loan originator license or temporary loan originator license to an out-of-state applicant who meets certain criteria, to make changes regarding derivative transactions by banks, and to make changes to the Uniform Commercial Funds Transfers law regarding remittance transfers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-12-05 - Senate - Senate - House Amendments (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-04 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-04 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 55 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-22 Effective Date
2012-12-19 Governor' Action
2012-12-27 End of 10-day period
2012-12-14 Sent to Governor
2012-12-05 Concurrence
2012-05-22 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2012-05-16 Committee Report - S
2012-04-24 To Financial Institutions
2012-04-24 Introduced to House
2012-12-04 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2012-11-29 Committee Report - S
2012-05-23 To Financial Institutions, Housing & Urban Development
2012-05-23 Introduced to Senate

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11Amended CodeCitation Text
1109Amended CodeCitation Text
110922Amended CodeCitation Text
13Amended CodeCitation Text
1304Amended CodeCitation Text
130455Amended CodeCitation Text
1321Amended CodeCitation Text
132152Amended CodeCitation Text
1321537New CodeSee Bill Text
1321538New CodeSee Bill Text
1322Amended CodeCitation Text
132202Amended CodeCitation Text
1322042New CodeSee Bill Text
1322043New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback