OH SB331 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Effective 4/12/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 101.83, 101.84, 101.85, 101.86, 101.87, 105.911, 150.06, 181.21, 355.02, 355.03, 355.04, 501.04, 3301.079, 3711.12, 4723.493, and 4723.50 and to repeal sections 133.021, 181.22, 181.26, 501.041, 718.60, 1521.031, 3711.20, 3711.21, 3711.22, 4723.49, 4723.491, 4723.492, 5101.345, 5101.91, 5101.92, 5913.12, 5913.13, and 5913.14 of the Revised Code and to repeal Section 209.61 of H.B. 49 of the 132nd General Assembly, Section 3 of H.B. 66 of the 132nd General Assembly, Sections 701.05 and 751.30 of H.B. 64 of the 131st General Assembly, and Section 265.70.20 of H.B. 1 of the 128th General Assembly to implement the recommendations of the Sunset Review Committee by terminating or renewing various agencies, and to require a Sunset Review Committee to be convened during each General Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Implement recommendations of Sunset Review Committee

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-12-17 - House - House Passed (Y: 83 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-02 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12 Effective 4/12/21
2020-12-18SenateConcurred in House amendments
2020-12-17HousePassed - Amended
2020-12-17HouseReported - Substitute: State and Local Government
2020-12-08HouseRefer to Committee: State and Local Government
2020-12-03HouseIntroduced
2020-12-02SenatePassed
2020-12-02SenateReported - Substitute: General Government and Agency Review
2020-06-30SenateRefer to Committee: General Government and Agency Review
2020-06-24SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10183Amended CodeCitation Text
10184Amended CodeCitation Text
10185Amended CodeCitation Text
10186Amended CodeCitation Text
10187Amended CodeCitation Text
105911Amended CodeCitation Text
133021Repealed CodeCitation Text
15006Amended CodeCitation Text
18121Amended CodeCitation Text
18122Repealed CodeCitation Text
18126Repealed CodeCitation Text
1521031Repealed CodeCitation Text
35502Amended CodeCitation Text
35503Amended CodeCitation Text
35504Amended CodeCitation Text
3301079Amended CodeCitation Text
371112Amended CodeCitation Text
371120Repealed CodeCitation Text
371121Repealed CodeCitation Text
371122Repealed CodeCitation Text
472349Repealed CodeCitation Text
4723491Repealed CodeCitation Text
4723492Repealed CodeCitation Text
4723493Amended CodeCitation Text
472350Amended CodeCitation Text
50104Amended CodeCitation Text
501041Repealed CodeCitation Text
5101345Repealed CodeCitation Text
510191Repealed CodeCitation Text
510192Repealed CodeCitation Text
591312Repealed CodeCitation Text
591313Repealed CodeCitation Text
591314Repealed CodeCitation Text
71860Repealed CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback