OH SB328 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-17 - Refer to Committee: Health
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To enact sections 4757.50, 4757.501, 5120.658, and 5164.071 of the Revised Code regarding doula services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Require Medicaid to cover doula services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-17HouseRefer to Committee: Health
2020-09-30HouseIntroduced
2020-09-23SenatePassed
2020-09-23SenateReported - Substitute: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2020-06-24SenateRefer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2020-06-23SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
475750New CodeSee Bill Text
4757501New CodeSee Bill Text
5120658New CodeSee Bill Text
5164071New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback