OH SB311 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 53-0)
Status: Enrolled on November 19 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 3701.13 and 3701.14 of the Revised Code to modify the law governing public health orders, quarantine, and isolation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limit Director of Health order-issuing authority

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-11-19 - House - House Passed (Y: 58 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-19 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-19HousePassed
2020-11-19HouseReported: State and Local Government
2020-11-17HouseRefer to Committee: State and Local Government
2020-09-30HouseIntroduced
2020-09-23SenatePassed
2020-09-02SenateReported - Substitute: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2020-05-20SenateRefer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2020-05-15SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
370113Amended CodeCitation Text
370114Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback