OH SB311 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-9)
Status: Engrossed on November 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-29 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-29 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 5.49 of the Revised Code to designate June 12 as "Women Veterans' Day."
Title
Designate Women Veterans' Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-28 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-29 | House | Introduced |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Passed |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Reported: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs |
2018-07-10 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Introduced |