OH SB310 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-12 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 3706.25, 4928.01, 4928.20, 4928.53, 4928.64, 4928.65, and 4928.66, to amend, for the purpose of adopting a new section number as indicated in parentheses, section 4928.65 (4928.645), and to enact new section 4928.65 and sections 4928.112, 4928.641, 4928.643, 4928.644, 4928.662, 4928.6610, 4928.6611, 4928.6612, 4928.6613, 4928.6614, 4928.6615, and 4928.6616 of the Revised Code to make changes to the renewable energy, energy efficiency, and peak demand reduction requirements, to prohibit the imposition of a waiting period before enrolling an eligible customer in the percentage of income payment plan, and to create a study committee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To make changes to the renewable energy, energy efficiency, and peak demand reduction requirements, to prohibit the imposition of a waiting period before enrolling an eligible customer in the percentage of income payment plan, and to create a study committee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Vote) (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 55 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 54 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-09-12 Effective Date
2014-06-13 Governor' Action
2014-06-16 End of 10-day period
2014-06-04 Sent to Governor
2014-05-28 Concurrence
2014-05-07 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2014-05-07 Committee Report - S
2014-03-28 To Public Utilities
2014-03-28 Introduced to House
2014-05-28 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2014-05-28 Committee Report - S
2014-05-08 To Public Utilities
2014-05-08 Introduced to Senate

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
37Amended CodeCitation Text
3706Amended CodeCitation Text
370625Amended CodeCitation Text
49Amended CodeCitation Text
4928Amended CodeCitation Text
492801Amended CodeCitation Text
492820Amended CodeCitation Text
492853Amended CodeCitation Text
492864Amended CodeCitation Text
4928641New CodeSee Bill Text
492865Amended CodeCitation Text
492866Amended CodeCitation Text
4928661New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback