OH SB308 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-10 - Refer to Committee: Civil Justice
Pending: House Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend section 2305.2311 and to enact section 2305.2312 of the Revised Code to revise the law governing immunity from civil liability for health care providers during disasters, to provide qualified civil immunity to service providers providing services during and after a government-declared disaster or emergency due to COVID-19, and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards civil liability of service providers in emergency

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-10HouseRefer to Committee: Civil Justice
2020-06-09HouseIntroduced
2020-06-03SenatePassed
2020-06-03SenateReported - Substitute: Judiciary
2020-05-06SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2020-05-05SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
23052311Amended CodeCitation Text
23052312New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback