OH SB304 | 2007-2008 | 127th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-6)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-05-21 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-05-21 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Summary
To amend sections 2151.3516 and 2151.3530 of the Revised Code to increase the time after birth that a parent may voluntarily deliver the child to a safe haven without the parent expressing an intent to return for the child and to require the Department of Job and Family Services to develop an educational plan for informing at-risk populations of the provisions of the Safe Havens Law.
Title
Give up child at safe haven-increase time after birth for doing so
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-05-21 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2008-05-15 | Committee Report | |
2008-03-11 | To Health, Human Services, & Aging | |
2008-03-11 | Introduced to House | |
2008-05-22 | To Health | |
2008-05-22 | Introduced to Senate |
Ohio State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/bills.cfm?ID=127_SB_304 |