OH SB30 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - Effective 7/24/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To create the Women's Suffrage Centennial Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Create the Women's Suffrage Centennial Commission

Sponsors

Rep. Steven Arndt [R]Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]Rep. Louis Blessing [R]Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]
Rep. Janine Boyd [D]Rep. Juanita Brent [D]Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. James Butler [R]
Rep. Jamie Callender [R]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]Rep. Jack Cera [D]
Rep. Randi Clites [D]Rep. Erica Crawley [D]Rep. Jon Cross [R]Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]
Rep. Robert Cupp [R]Rep. Anthony DeVitis [R]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]
Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Doug Green [R]Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]
Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]Rep. Paula Hicks-Hudson [D]Rep. Adam Holmes [R]Rep. Glenn Holmes [D]
Rep. James Hoops [R]Rep. Stephanie Howse [D]Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]Rep. Don Jones [R]
Rep. Brigid Kelly [D]Rep. Bernadine Kent [D]Rep. Darrell Kick [R]Rep. Kyle Koehler [R]
Rep. Sarah LaTourette [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]Rep. George Lang [R]Rep. David Leland [D]
Rep. Michele Lepore-hagan [D]Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]Rep. Beth Liston [D]Rep. Susan Manchester [R]
Rep. Don Manning [R]Rep. Gayle Manning [R]Rep. Riordan McClain [R]Rep. Adam Miller [D]
Rep. Joe Miller [D]Rep. Jessica Miranda [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]
Rep. John Patterson [D]Rep. Rick Perales [R]Rep. Phil Plummer [R]Rep. Bill Reineke [R]
Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Bill Roemer [R]Rep. John Rogers [D]
Rep. Mark Romanchuk [R]Rep. Allison Russo [D]Rep. Scott Ryan [R]Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]
Rep. Gary Scherer [R]Rep. William Seitz [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Michael Skindell [D]
Rep. Kent Smith [D]Rep. Ryan Smith [R]Rep. Todd Smith [R]Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]
Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Reggie Stoltzfus [R]Rep. Fred Strahorn [D]Rep. Bride Sweeney [D]
Rep. Emilia Strong Sykes [D]Rep. Terrence Upchurch [D]Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Scott Wiggam [R]
Rep. Shane Wilkin [R]Sen. Brian Hill [R]

Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-24 Effective 7/24/19
2019-04-11HousePassed
2019-04-11HouseReported: State and Local Government
2019-03-19HouseRefer to Committee: State and Local Government
2019-03-12HouseIntroduced
2019-02-26SenatePassed
2019-02-26SenateReported - Amended: Government Oversight and Reform
2019-02-19SenateRefer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform
2019-02-12SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback