OH SB291 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 8 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-08 - Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 8 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-08 - Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 5.29 of the Revised Code to designate September as "Pain Awareness Month."
Title
Designates an awareness month
Sponsors
Sen. Kenny Yuko [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-12-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 88 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-16 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-16 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-08 | House | Passed |
2016-12-07 | House | Informally passed |
2016-11-16 | House | Reported: Health and Aging |
2016-11-10 | House | Refer to Committee: Health and Aging |
2016-05-25 | House | Introduced |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Passed |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Reported: Health and Human Services |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Health and Human Services |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |