OH SB272 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend section 4755.48 and to enact sections 4755.57 and 4755.571 of the Revised Code to enter into the Physical Therapy Licensure Compact.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enter into the Physical Therapy Licensure Compact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-25HouseIntroduced
2020-06-25HouseIntroduced
2020-06-10SenatePassed
2020-06-09SenateReported: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2020-02-12SenateRefer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2020-02-05SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
475548Amended CodeCitation Text
475557New CodeSee Bill Text
4755571New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback