OH SB260 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 49-28)
Status: Passed on August 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 49-28)
Status: Passed on August 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To enact section 5.2275 of the Revised Code to designate May as "Pediatric Stroke Awareness Month."
Title
To designate May as "Pediatric Stroke Awareness Month."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-24 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-06 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-04 | Governor' Action | |
2012-05-08 | End of 10-day period | |
2012-04-26 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-24 | Concurrence | |
2012-02-01 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2012-01-26 | Committee Report | |
2011-11-21 | To Health, Human Services, & Aging | |
2011-11-21 | Introduced to House | |
2012-04-24 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2012-04-18 | Committee Report | |
2012-02-02 | To Health & Aging | |
2012-02-02 | Introduced to Senate |