OH SB258 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-7)
Status: Enrolled on December 17 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-23 - Amendments laid over under the rule
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 503.40, 503.41, 503.42, 503.43, 503.44, 503.47, 503.48, 503.49, 503.50, 715.61, 2927.17, 2945.37, 2945.371, 2945.38, 4731.04, 4731.15, 4731.41, 5122.02, 5122.03, 5122.11, and 5122.111; to enact sections 503.411, 4732.40, 4732.41, and 5122.112; and to repeal sections 503.45 and 503.46 of the Revised Code to enter into the Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact (PSYPACT), to make changes to the requirements for competency evaluations and mental health treatment in criminal cases, and to make changes to the massage therapy licensing law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enters into the Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-12-17 - House - House Passed (Y: 79 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-16 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-23SenateAmendments laid over under the rule
2020-12-17HousePassed - Amended
2020-12-16HouseReported - Substitute: Health
2020-06-03HouseRefer to Committee: Health
2020-06-02HouseIntroduced
2020-05-20SenatePassed
2020-05-20SenateReported: Finance Subcommittee on Health and Medicaid
2020-01-22SenateRefer to Committee: Finance Subcommittee on Health and Medicaid
2020-01-08SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
292717Amended CodeCitation Text
294537Amended CodeCitation Text
2945371Amended CodeCitation Text
294538Amended CodeCitation Text
47New CodeSee Bill Text
473104Amended CodeCitation Text
473115Amended CodeCitation Text
473141Amended CodeCitation Text
4732New CodeSee Bill Text
473240New CodeSee Bill Text
473241New CodeSee Bill Text
50340Amended CodeCitation Text
50341Amended CodeCitation Text
503411New CodeSee Bill Text
50342Amended CodeCitation Text
50343Amended CodeCitation Text
50344Amended CodeCitation Text
50345Repealed CodeCitation Text
50346Repealed CodeCitation Text
50347Amended CodeCitation Text
50348Amended CodeCitation Text
50349Amended CodeCitation Text
50350Amended CodeCitation Text
512202Amended CodeCitation Text
512203Amended CodeCitation Text
512211Amended CodeCitation Text
5122111Amended CodeCitation Text
5122112New CodeSee Bill Text
71561Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback