OH SB255 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 31-2)
Status: Enrolled on December 13 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-27 - Speaker Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 109.572, 121.08, 2925.01, 4713.01, 4713.69, 4735.181, 4735.99, 4776.10, and 4776.20, to enact sections 9.78, 101.62, 101.63, 101.64, 101.65, 103.26, 103.27, 4735.22, 4764.01 to 4764.21, 4764.99, 4798.01, 4798.02, and 4798.03, of the Revised Code to establish a statewide policy on occupational regulation, to allow an individual who has been convicted of a criminal offense to request a licensing authority to determine whether the individual is disqualified from receiving or holding a professional license based on conviction, to require standing committees of the General Assembly to periodically review occupational licensing boards regarding their sunset, to require the Legislative Service Commission to issue reports of occupational licensing bills and state regulation of occupations, to require the licensure of home inspectors, to create the Ohio Home Inspector Board to regulate the licensure and performance of home inspectors, to require realtors who recommend home inspectors to provide a list of home inspectors, and to regulate the practice of makeup artistry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reform occupational licensing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 56 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-11 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-27HouseSpeaker Signed
2018-12-19SenateConcurred in House amendments
2018-12-13HousePassed - Amended
2018-12-13HouseInformally passed
2018-12-13HouseReported - Substitute: Government Accountability and Oversight
2018-12-11HouseRe-referred: Government Accountability and Oversight
2018-12-11HouseRe-referred: Rules and Reference
2018-12-05HouseReported - Substitute: Federalism and Interstate Relations
2018-11-13HouseRefer to Committee: Federalism and Interstate Relations
2018-07-02HouseIntroduced
2018-06-27SenatePassed
2018-06-27SenateReported - Substitute: Government Oversight and Reform
2018-02-20SenateRefer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform
2018-02-12SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1New CodeSee Bill Text
101New CodeSee Bill Text
10162New CodeSee Bill Text
10163New CodeSee Bill Text
10164New CodeSee Bill Text
10165New CodeSee Bill Text
103New CodeSee Bill Text
10326New CodeSee Bill Text
10327New CodeSee Bill Text
109Amended CodeCitation Text
109572Amended CodeCitation Text
121Amended CodeCitation Text
12108Amended CodeCitation Text
125Amended CodeCitation Text
12522Amended CodeCitation Text
145Amended CodeCitation Text
145012Amended CodeCitation Text
15Repealed CodeCitation Text
1521Repealed CodeCitation Text
1521031Repealed CodeCitation Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2925Amended CodeCitation Text
292501Amended CodeCitation Text
3Amended CodeCitation Text
355Amended CodeCitation Text
35502Amended CodeCitation Text
35503Amended CodeCitation Text
35504Amended CodeCitation Text
33Amended CodeCitation Text
3301Amended CodeCitation Text
330161Amended CodeCitation Text
3333Amended CodeCitation Text
3333731Repealed CodeCitation Text
333374Amended CodeCitation Text
41Amended CodeCitation Text
4104Amended CodeCitation Text
410433Amended CodeCitation Text
4141Amended CodeCitation Text
414108Repealed CodeCitation Text
4141131Amended CodeCitation Text
414125Amended CodeCitation Text
4141292Amended CodeCitation Text
47New CodeSee Bill Text
4713Amended CodeCitation Text
471301Amended CodeCitation Text
471369Amended CodeCitation Text
4723Amended CodeCitation Text
472302Amended CodeCitation Text
4723493Amended CodeCitation Text
4725Amended CodeCitation Text
472548Amended CodeCitation Text
472549Amended CodeCitation Text
472552Amended CodeCitation Text
4735Amended CodeCitation Text
4735181Amended CodeCitation Text
473522New CodeSee Bill Text
473599Amended CodeCitation Text
4747Amended CodeCitation Text
474704Amended CodeCitation Text
474705Amended CodeCitation Text
474706Amended CodeCitation Text
474707Amended CodeCitation Text
474708Amended CodeCitation Text
474709Amended CodeCitation Text
474710Amended CodeCitation Text
474711Amended CodeCitation Text
474712Amended CodeCitation Text
474713Amended CodeCitation Text
4751Amended CodeCitation Text
475103Amended CodeCitation Text
4753Amended CodeCitation Text
475305Amended CodeCitation Text
4757Amended CodeCitation Text
475722Amended CodeCitation Text
475723Amended CodeCitation Text
4758Amended CodeCitation Text
475810Amended CodeCitation Text
475811Amended CodeCitation Text
4764New CodeSee Bill Text
476401New CodeSee Bill Text
476402New CodeSee Bill Text
476403New CodeSee Bill Text
476404New CodeSee Bill Text
476405New CodeSee Bill Text
476406New CodeSee Bill Text
476407New CodeSee Bill Text
476408New CodeSee Bill Text
476409New CodeSee Bill Text
476410New CodeSee Bill Text
476411New CodeSee Bill Text
476412New CodeSee Bill Text
476413New CodeSee Bill Text
476414New CodeSee Bill Text
476415New CodeSee Bill Text
476416New CodeSee Bill Text
476417New CodeSee Bill Text
476418New CodeSee Bill Text
476419New CodeSee Bill Text
476420New CodeSee Bill Text
476499New CodeSee Bill Text
4765Amended CodeCitation Text
476502Amended CodeCitation Text
4776Amended CodeCitation Text
477610Amended CodeCitation Text
477620Amended CodeCitation Text
4798New CodeSee Bill Text
479801New CodeSee Bill Text
479802New CodeSee Bill Text
479803New CodeSee Bill Text
51Repealed CodeCitation Text
5101Repealed CodeCitation Text
510191Repealed CodeCitation Text
510192Repealed CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA132-SB-255
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/sb255/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/sb255/RS/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/sb255/PS/02?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/sb255/RH/03?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/sb255/RCH/04?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/sb255/RH/05?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/sb255/PH/06?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/sb255/EN/07?format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA132-SB-255

Bill Comments

feedback