OH SB243 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-14 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-14 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 4111.03 and to enact section 4111.031 of the Revised Code to except traveling to and from a worksite and performing certain routine tasks from the overtime pay requirement.
Title
Except traveling to and from and routine tasks from overtime pay
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Brenner [R] | Rep. Bob Peterson [R] | Sen. William Coley [R] | Sen. Matthew Dolan [R] |
Sen. Robert Hackett [R] | Sen. Terry Johnson [R] | Sen. Timothy Schaffer [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-02 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-02 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Passed - Amended |
2020-12-08 | Senate | Informally passed |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Informally passed |
2020-12-02 | Senate | Informally passed |
2020-12-02 | Senate | Reported: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce |
2019-11-26 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
41 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
41 | 11 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
41 | 11 | 031 | New Code | See Bill Text |