OH SB241 | 2007-2008 | 127th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-07-18 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-07-18 - Effective Date
Summary
To amend section 301.28 of the Revised Code to modify the law governing payment of county expenses by a financial transaction device.
Title
Counties-payments by credit/debit cards etc.-modify law
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Cates [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-07-18 | Effective Date | |
2008-04-18 | Governor Action | |
2008-04-22 | End of 10-day Period | |
2008-04-10 | Sent to Governor | |
2007-12-12 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2007-12-12 | Committee Report | |
2007-10-10 | To State & Local Government & Veterans Affairs | |
2007-10-10 | Introduced to House | |
2008-04-02 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2008-02-07 | Committee Report | |
2007-12-12 | To Financial Institutions, Real Estate, & Securities | |
2007-12-12 | Introduced to Senate |
Ohio State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/bills.cfm?ID=127_SB_241 |