OH SB235 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 11 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-12-17 - Referred to committee: Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To enact section 5.54 of the Revised Code to designate the first full week in May "Public Service Recognition Week."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designate Public Service Recognition Week

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-12-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-12-11 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-12-17HouseReferred to committee: Finance
2024-12-16HouseIntroduced
2024-12-11SenatePassed
2024-12-11SenateReported: General Government
2024-04-10SenateReferred to committee: General Government
2024-03-19SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback