OH SB229 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-9)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-02 - Reported: Health
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-02 - Reported: Health
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 5.2522 of the Revised Code to designate the second week of November as "Ohio Diabetes Awareness-Heart Connection Week."
Title
Designate Diabetes Awareness-Heart Connection Week
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-02 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-02 | House | Reported: Health |
2020-05-12 | House | Refer to Committee: Health |
2020-05-05 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Passed |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Reported: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Introduced |