OH SB220 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 8 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-08 - Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 8 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-08 - Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 148.04 and 148.06 of the Revised Code to authorize the Ohio Public Employees Deferred Compensation Board and local governments to establish designated Roth account features and other tax-deferred or nontax-deferred features permitted for government deferred compensation plans.
Title
Authorizes offering of Roth-type deferred compensation plans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-17 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-17 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-08 | House | Passed |
2016-11-17 | House | Reported: State Government |
2016-05-05 | House | Refer to Committee: State Government |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Passed |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Reported: State and Local Government |
2015-10-07 | Senate | Refer to Committee: State and Local Government |
2015-10-05 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 48 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 48 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 48 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |