OH SB21 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Effective 9/21/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend section 4765.401 of the Revised Code regarding emergency medical services and stroke patient protocols.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards emergency medical services and stroke patient protocols

Sponsors

Sen. Nickie Antonio [D]Sen. Nathan Manning [R]Rep. Cindy Abrams [R]Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]
Rep. Adam Bird [R]Rep. Willis Blackshear [D]Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]Rep. Juanita Brent [D]
Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]Rep. Gary Click [R]
Rep. Erica Crawley [D]Rep. Rodney Creech [R]Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]Rep. Alessandro Cutrona [R]
Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]
Rep. Diane Grendell [R]Rep. Jennifer Gross [R]Rep. Thomas Hall [R]Rep. Paula Hicks-Hudson [D]
Rep. Larry Householder [R]Rep. Stephanie Howse [D]Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]Rep. Dontavius Jarrells [D]
Rep. Marilyn John [R]Rep. Don Jones [R]Rep. Darrell Kick [R]Rep. Jeff LaRe [R]
Rep. Laura Lanese [R]Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Michele Lepore-Hagan [D]Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]
Rep. Beth Liston [D]Rep. Mike Loychik [R]Rep. Gayle Manning [R]Rep. Riordan McClain [R]
Rep. Adam Miller [D]Rep. Jessica Miranda [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Rep. Scott Oelslager [R]
Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Phil Plummer [R]Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]
Rep. Phillip Robinson [D]Rep. Allison Russo [D]Rep. Jean Schmidt [R]Rep. William Seitz [R]
Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Michael Skindell [D]Rep. Kent Smith [D]Rep. Monique Smith [D]
Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Jason Stephens [R]Rep. Bride Sweeney [D]
Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Andrea White [R]Rep. Shane Wilkin [R]
Rep. Tom Young [R]Sen. Louis Blessing [R]Sen. Andrew Brenner [R]Sen. Hearcel Craig [D]
Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]Sen. Teresa Fedor [D]Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]
Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Stephen Huffman [R]Sen. Terry Johnson [R]Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]
Sen. George Lang [R]Sen. Tina Maharath [D]Sen. Bill Reineke [R]Sen. Mark Romanchuk [R]
Sen. Michael Rulli [R]Sen. Timothy Schaffer [R]Sen. Kirk Schuring [R]Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]
Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]Sen. Sandra Williams [D]Sen. Steve Wilson [R]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2021-06-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-10 Effective 9/21/21
2021-06-10HousePassed
2021-05-18HouseReported: Transportation and Public Safety
2021-03-09HouseRefer to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety
2021-03-03SenatePassed
2021-03-03SenateReported: Health
2021-01-27SenateRefer to Committee: Health
2021-01-26SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4765401Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-SB-21
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb21/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb21/RS/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb21/PS/02?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb21/RH/03/sb21_03_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb21/PH/04/sb21_04_PH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb21/EN/05/sb21_05_EN?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15491&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15563&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15850&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15852&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15877&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16126&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16731&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16728&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16724&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16988&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17086&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17274&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-SB-21

Bill Comments

feedback