OH SB21 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-9)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Effective 3/24/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 1701.01, 1701.03, 1701.04, 1701.05, 1701.38, 1701.59, 1701.591, and 1701.94 and to enact section 1701.96 of the Revised Code to allow a corporation to become a benefit corporation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allow corporation to become benefit corporation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-11-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 84 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-24 Effective 3/24/21
2020-12-02SenateConcurred in House amendments
2020-11-24SenateAmendments laid over under the rule
2020-11-18HousePassed
2020-09-24HouseInformally passed
2020-09-22HouseInformally passed
2020-05-13HouseReported - Substitute: Civil Justice
2019-03-19HouseRefer to Committee: Civil Justice
2019-03-12HouseIntroduced
2019-03-06SenatePassed
2019-02-28SenateReported - Amended: Judiciary
2019-02-13SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2019-02-12SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
17Amended CodeCitation Text
1701Amended CodeCitation Text
170101Amended CodeCitation Text
170103Amended CodeCitation Text
170104Amended CodeCitation Text
170105Amended CodeCitation Text
170138Amended CodeCitation Text
170159Amended CodeCitation Text
1701591Amended CodeCitation Text
170194Amended CodeCitation Text
170196New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback