OH SB19 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Passed on September 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-28 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Passed on September 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-28 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 4510.31 and 4510.311 of the Revised Code to permit a judge to elect to order the Registrar of Motor Vehicles not to suspend the probationary driver's license, restricted license, or temporary instruction permit of certain juvenile repeat traffic violators, to require the Director of Public Safety to establish standards for advanced juvenile driver improvement programs, and to transfer authority to establish standards for juvenile driver improvement programs from the Registrar of Motor Vehicles to the Director of Public Safety.
Title
To permit a judge to elect to order the Registrar of Motor Vehicles not to suspend the probationary driver's license, restricted license, or temporary instruction permit of certain juvenile repeat traffic violators, to require the Director of Public Safety to establish standards for advanced juvenile driver improvement programs, and to transfer authority to establish standards for juvenile driver improvement programs from the Registrar of Motor Vehicles to the Director of Public Safety.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Bacon [R] | Sen. Edna Brown [D] | Sen. Dave Burke [R] | Sen. David Daniels [R] |
Sen. John Eklund [R] | Rep. Timothy Grendell [R] | Sen. Cliff Hite [R] | Sen. Jim Hughes [R] |
Sen. Shannon Jones [R] | Rep. Kris Jordan [R] | Sen. Eric Kearney [D] | Sen. Peggy Lehner [R] |
Rep. Gayle Manning [R] | Sen. Larry Obhof [R] | Rep. Thomas Patton [R] | Rep. William Seitz [R] |
Sen. Mark Wagoner [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-13 - Senate - Senate - House Amendments (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 85 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 85 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-28 | Effective Date | |
2012-06-26 | Governor' Action | |
2012-07-02 | End of 10-day period | |
2012-06-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-06-13 | Concurrence | |
2011-12-13 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2011-11-30 | Committee Report | |
2011-02-01 | To Judiciary Criminal Justice | |
2011-02-01 | Introduced to House | |
2012-06-12 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2012-03-28 | Committee Report - S | |
2011-12-15 | To Criminal Justice | |
2011-12-15 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
45 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 10 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 10 | 311 | Amended Code | Citation Text |