OH SB18 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 50-18)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Effective 3/31/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 4141.321, 5701.11, 5733.41, and 5747.41 and to enact section 5747.065 of the Revised Code and to amend Section 36 of H.B. 481 of the 133rd General Assembly to modify the law governing taxation and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Incorporates federal IRS changes

Sponsors

Sen. Kristina Roegner [R]Sen. Timothy Schaffer [R]Rep. Cindy Abrams [R]Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]
Rep. Willis Blackshear [D]Rep. Janine Boyd [D]Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]
Rep. Gary Click [R]Rep. Robert Cupp [R]Rep. Alessandro Cutrona [R]Rep. Bill Dean [R]
Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Mark Fraizer [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]
Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Jennifer Gross [R]Rep. Thomas Hall [R]Rep. Paula Hicks-Hudson [D]
Rep. Brett Hudson Hillyer [R]Rep. Larry Householder [R]Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]Rep. Dontavius Jarrells [D]
Rep. Mark Johnson [R]Rep. Don Jones [R]Rep. Jeff LaRe [R]Rep. Michele Lepore-Hagan [D]
Rep. Scott Lipps [R]Rep. Riordan McClain [R]Rep. Derek Merrin [R]Rep. Joseph Miller [D]
Rep. Jessica Miranda [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]
Rep. Bill Roemer [R]Rep. Jean Schmidt [R]Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]Rep. Jason Stephens [R]
Rep. D. J. Swearingen [R]Rep. Emilia Strong Sykes [D]Rep. Daniel Troy [D]Rep. Thomas West [D]
Rep. Andrea White [R]Rep. Scott Wiggam [R]Rep. Bob Young [R]Rep. Tom Young [R]
Sen. Louis Blessing [R]Sen. Jerry Cirino [R]Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R]
Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]Sen. Stephen Huffman [R]
Sen. Terry Johnson [R]Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]Sen. George Lang [R]Sen. Robert McColley [R]
Sen. Sandra O'Brien [R]Sen. Bob Peterson [R]Sen. Bill Reineke [R]Sen. Kirk Schuring [R]
Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]Sen. Steve Wilson [R]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2021-03-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-24 Effective 3/31/21
2021-03-24SenateConcurred in House amendments
2021-03-24HousePassed
2021-03-24HouseReported - Substitute: Ways and Means
2021-02-17HouseRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2021-02-10SenatePassed
2021-02-09SenateReported - Substitute: Ways and Means
2021-01-27SenateRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2021-01-26SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4141321Amended CodeCitation Text
570111Amended CodeCitation Text
573341Amended CodeCitation Text
5747065New CodeSee Bill Text
574741Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-SB-18
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb18/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb18/RS/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb18/PS/02?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb18/RH/03?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb18/PH/04?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb18/EN/05?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb18/PH/04/sb18_04_PH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb18/EN/05/sb18_05_EN?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15505&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15580&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15593&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15601&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15648&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15670&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16158&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16165&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16159&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16215&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16257&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16334&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-SB-18

Bill Comments

feedback